Quan, Minh Duc (CPSO#: 61167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2580 Shepard Avenue
Unit 31
Mississauga ON  L5A 4K3
Phone: (905) 615-0468
Fax: (905) 615-8495
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Minh D. Quan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Quan ( CPSO# 61167 )

Business Address:
31 - 2580 Sheppard Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5A 4K3
Phone Number: (905) 615-0468

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINH DUC QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1990