Quance, Daniel Richard (CPSO#: 51715)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001