Quantz, Mackenzie Alexander (CPSO#: 72400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room B6-110
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3144
Fax: (519) 663-3186
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Quantz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Quantz ( CPSO# 72400 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre - University Campus
339 Windermere Road
Room B6-110
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3144

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiothoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MACKENZIE ALEXANDER QUANTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUANTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998