Quartermain, Melanie Anne (CPSO#: 70126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 16
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone: (519) 745-7932
Fax: (519) 745-1881
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Grosso Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Quartermain ( CPSO# 70126 )
Dr. P. Grosso ( CPSO# 70326 )

Business Address:
Suite 115
675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0623

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE ANNE QUARTERMAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUARTERMAIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998