Quastel, Adam Gabriel (CPSO#: 68381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Mental Health Service
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3082
Fax: (416) 864-5480
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Quastel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Quastel ( CPSO# 68381 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Mental Health Service
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3082

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM GABRIEL QUASTEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUASTEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000