Quayyum, Zahirul (CPSO#: 77126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Farsi, Hindi, Persian, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Dhaka, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 Connell Street
Suite 3
Woodstock NB  E7M 5G5
Phone: 506 328 1086
Fax: 506 328 3121
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parveen-Quayyum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2015


Corporation Name: Dr. Parveen-Quayyum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAHIRUL QUAYYUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAYYUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2001