Queen, Daniel Stephen (CPSO#: 84613)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Everett Chalmers Hospital PO Box 9000 700 Priestman Street Fredericton, NB E3B 5N5
Date Received: 05 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 16 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2007 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015