Quevillon, Joseph Albert Jean (CPSO#: 28901)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Quevillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Unit 1B 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa ON K1G 0Y9 Website: http://www.accuro.ca Telephone: (613) - 738-1242 Fax: (613) - 738-0562
Date Received: 18 Dec 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2015