Quigg, Thomas Mark (CPSO#: 58060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone: (705) 445-5102
Fax: (705) 445-1375
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. M. Quigg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2006

Dr. T. Quigg ( CPSO# 58060 )

Business Address:
186 Erie Street
Suite 204
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone Number: (705) 445-5102

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. THOMAS MARK QUIGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIGG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1988