Quigley, Ciara Joanna (CPSO#: 69185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LAMP Health Services
185 5th Street
Etobicoke ON  M8V 2Z5
Phone: (416) 252-6475
Fax: (416) 252-6395
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CIARA JOANNA QUIGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIGLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1997