Quigley, Mark John (CPSO#: 52333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
45 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 5W9
Phone: 647-998-0470
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Quigley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Quigley ( CPSO# 52333 )

Business Address:
Radiology Now Inc.
45 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M2N 5W9
Phone Number: (416) 964-7265

Business Address:
83 Kingsway Crescent
Toronto ON  M8X 2R8
Phone Number: (647) 998-0470

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 18, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr.Mark John Quigley, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Quigley to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                         DR. MARK JOHN QUIGLEY
                                            ("Dr. Quigley")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Quigley, certificate of registration number 52333, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214916 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my diagnostic
                  radiology practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Quigley, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Quigley, undertake that, effective immediately, I will cease
                        to engage in any of the following areas of practice:
                  
                        (i)   The interpretation of CT images.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Quigley, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Quigley, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Quigley, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Quigley, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (12)  I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Quigley was the subject of a College investigation into whether
                        he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his
                        diagnostic radiology practice.  As a result of the investigation,
                        Dr. Quigley has agreed not to practise any of the following: the
                        interpretation of CT images.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Quigley, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mark John Quigley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 18, 2016:

Dr. Quigley was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his diagnostic radiology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Quigley has agreed not to practise any of the following: the interpretation of CT images.