Quinn, Andrew Reynolds (CPSO#: 59397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 McClellan St
Bag Service # 99
Tweed ON  K0K 3J0
Phone: (613) 478-1211
Fax: (613) 478-1220
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-5511
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

274 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Canada
Phone: 613-968-5709
Fax: 613-968-5709
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Quinn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Quinn ( CPSO# 59397 )

Business Address:
Tweed & District Community
Health Care and Senior Services
41 McClellan Street
Postal Bag #99
Tweed ON  K0K 3J0
Phone Number: (613) 478-1211

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW REYNOLDS QUINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1989