Quinonez, Guillermo Emilio (CPSO#: 53659)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad De El Salvador, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2007