Quinonez, Luis Guillermo Antonio (CPSO#: 66690)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 26 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 02 Jan 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 03 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004