Quintal, Diane Carmen (CPSO#: 51722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Names: Quintal, Marie Carmen Diane (used until: 25 Nov 2009 )     Quintal, Diane Carmen (used until: 04 Mar 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Montreal Road
Suite 403
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 744-4482
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE CARMEN QUINTAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINTAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1984