Quinton, Cindy Lee (CPSO#: 58325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: Quinton-Gladstone, Cindy Lee (used until: 08 Feb 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
4th floor
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5135
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY LEE QUINTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991