Quinton, Jill Alison (CPSO#: 86454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
300-100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: 613 564-3950
Fax: 613 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McVicar Quinton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Quinton ( CPSO# 86454 )
Dr. J. McVicar ( CPSO# 86456 )

Business Address:
300 - 100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Critical Care Wing 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL ALISON QUINTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009