Quirante-Flora, Fe Naval (CPSO#: 54478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog, Visayan

Education:Far Eastern University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
45 Overlea Boulevard
Suite B-9
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone: (416) 421-1240
Fax: (416) 421-9829
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FE NAVAL QUIRANTE-FLORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIRANTE-FLORA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: November 1, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)