Quirion, Charles-Antoine Joseph (CPSO#: 86604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: 6137322811
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Quirion Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Quirion ( CPSO# 86604 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6B 3E5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES-ANTOINE JOSEPH QUIRION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIRION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010