Quirk, Keith Castle (CPSO#: 14263)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: J.E.Y's Business Records Storage 871 Jet Avenue P1B 2W9 Tel: 705-494-7575 Fax: 705-494-7428
Date Received: 07 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013