Quiroga Ponce, Horacio Jose (CPSO#: 96691)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Austral, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013