Quon, Deanna Lee (CPSO#: 84382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: Devitt, Deanna Lee (used until: 11 Feb 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-7350 Ext. 75595
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Quon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Quon ( CPSO# 84397 )
Dr. D. Quon ( CPSO# 84382 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-7350

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
451 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 744-2422

Business Address:
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3044

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 19 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEANNA LEE QUON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011