Qureshi, Abdul Majid (CPSO#: 25468)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Birmingham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.Y. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Qureshi ( CPSO# 25468 )
Dr. R. Qureshi ( CPSO# 74095 )

Business Address:
St. Michaels Hospital
2nd Floor Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5074

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4175

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 100 751 Victoria Street Kitchener ON N2M 5N4 Tel: 519-570-2198
Date Received: 18 Jan 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jan 2017