Qureshi, Arif Sikandar (CPSO#: 58128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Listowel Clinic
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Qureshi ( CPSO# 58128 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200


Corporation Name: Dr. Terry Suggitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gateman ( CPSO# 100625)
Dr. R. Warren ( CPSO# 52853 )
Dr. T. Suggitt ( CPSO# 77060 )
Dr. P. Rutherford ( CPSO# 19820 )
Dr. A. Qureshi ( CPSO# 58128 )
Dr. B. Matthews ( CPSO# 58936 )
Dr. R. Latuskie ( CPSO# 66312 )
Dr. G. Edmonds ( CPSO# 76383 )
Dr. R. Annis ( CPSO# 59933 )
Dr. L. Hayward ( CPSO# 95251 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIF SIKANDAR QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1989