Qureshi, Shireen Abdulmajeead Mohammad (CPSO#: 71771)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: Al-Qureshi, Adra Shirin Abdulmajeed Mohammed (used until: 25 Aug 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 13 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002