Qureshy, Bushra (CPSO#: 28561)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 31 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Albany Medical Clinic, 807 Broadview Avenue, Toronto, ON, M4K 2P8
Date Received: 23 Aug 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2016

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: May 31, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Qureshy voluntarily resigned from the College, effective May 31, 2016, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.