Qutube, Salahuddin (CPSO#: 97302)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Gulbarga University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Feb 2012 to 16 Apr 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 17 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013