Ra, Greta Sang-Myung (CPSO#: 89254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Disera Drive, Unit 170
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone: (905) 763-6333
Fax: (888) 501-9616
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 Holly Street, Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 486-8088
Fax: (416) 486-7888
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4610 Highway 7, Suite 200
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Greta Ra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ra ( CPSO# 89254 )

Business Address:
170 - 10 Disera Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone Number: (905) 763-6333

Business Address:
Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRETA SANG-MYUNG RA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013