Ra, Paul Mu-Ung (CPSO#: 44013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Nov 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Chonnam National University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Pathology
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 990-9510
Fax: (519) 254-6861
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Ra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ra ( CPSO# 44013 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL MU-UNG RA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1985