Rabbani, Farhang (CPSO#: 63664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Treatment Centers of America
Department of Urology
600 Celebrate Life Parkway
Newnan GA  30265
United States
Phone: (770) 400-6000
Fax: (770) 400-6850

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - California
USA - Georgia
USA - New York
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARHANG RABBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABBANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992