Rabbat, Christian George (CPSO#: 66872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room M320
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33542
Fax: (905) 521-6153
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Rabbat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rabbat ( CPSO# 66872 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital Hamilton
Room M318
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8S 1S7
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
327 Reynolds Street
Oakville ON  L6J 3L7
Phone Number: (905) 815-5111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN GEORGE RABBAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABBAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997