Rabeneck, Linda (CPSO#: 44014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Care Ontario
620 University Avenue
16th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2L7
Phone: (416) 217-1254
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA RABENECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABENECK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2002