Rabheru, Kiran (CPSO#: 32494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8010
Fax: (613) 737-8115
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8050
Fax: (613) 737-8115
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kiran Rabheru Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rabheru ( CPSO# 32494 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8083

Business Address:
Elizabeth Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
Room 131Y/137Y
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C7
Phone Number: (613) 562-0283

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRAN RABHERU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABHERU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1980 to 14 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1981