Rabi, Doreen Marie (CPSO#: 74798)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2003