Rabi, Yacov (CPSO#: 74272)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Sep 1999 to 08 Oct 1999
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2003