Rabie, Rania Nancy (CPSO#: 79001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
Suite 204B
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-4545
Fax: (905) 853-4501
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANIA NANCY RABIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008