Rabin, Elijah Zephania (CPSO#: 23173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1970

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:Queen's University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 4th Avenue
3rd Floor Renal Clinic
Walker Cancer Centre
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 43513
Fax: (905) 641-5218
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Z. Rabin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rabin ( CPSO# 23173 )

Business Address:
1200 4th Avenue
3rd Floor Renal Clinic
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIJAH ZEPHANIA RABIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1970

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Jun 2003
Summary:

 On June 23, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rabin did not engage in sexual abuse of a 
 patient and, furthermore, that his conduct in that regard was not conduct unbecoming a physician 
 contrary to the legislation.

The Discipline Committee did find that Dr. Rabin committed an act of 
 professional misconduct that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
 by members as unprofessional regarding his writing of prescriptions for his common-law spouse.

On 
 October 2, 2003, the Discipline Committee released its written decision and reasons including its 
 decision on penalty.  The Discipline Committee was of the opinion that Dr. Rabin had been punished 
 sufficiently by the extensive publicity focusing on the allegations and, therefore, no further 
 action on penalty should be taken.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 20, 2003