Rabin, Erica Anne (CPSO#: 73331)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Feb 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 May 1999 to 30 May 1999
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2002 to 10 Feb 2002
Elective Trainee - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2002