Rabinovich, Alexander (CPSO#: 80696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Dundurn Street South, Unit 114
c/o Performance Physiotherapy
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Phone: (289) 389-8181
Fax: (289) 389-8111
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hamilton Foot Clinic
1508 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9B1K3
Canada
Phone: 9053854251
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Rabinovich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Waserman ( CPSO# 93730 )
Dr. A. Rabinovich ( CPSO# 80696 )

Business Address:
114 - 50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Phone Number: (289) 389-8181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER RABINOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABINOVICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2010