Rabinovitch, Deborah Lynn (CPSO#: 82660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Synergy Sports Medicine and
Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Ave
Toronto ON  M6H 1V5
Phone: (416) 703-3525
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Rm. UG26
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4213
Fax: (416) 480-6817
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Peliowski & Rabinovitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rabinovitch ( CPSO# 82660 )
Dr. A. Peliowski ( CPSO# 77624 )

Business Address:
Synergy Sports Medicine and
Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Ave
Toronto ON  M6H 1V5
Phone Number: (416) 703-3525

Business Address:
The Hospital For Sick Children
Dept. of Anesthesia & Pain Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 22 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN RABINOVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABINOVITCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 09 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010