Rabinovitch, Jed (CPSO#: 33191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 309
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 754-7511
Fax: (416) 754-7512
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jed Rabinovitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rabinovitch ( CPSO# 33191 )

Business Address:
309 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 754-7511


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JED RABINOVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABINOVITCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1982