Rabinovitch, Marlene (CPSO#: 25375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stanford Univeristy
School of Medicine
CCSR Building Suite 1215a
269 Campus Drive
Stanford CA  94305-5162
United States
Phone: (650) 723-8239
Fax: (650) 723-6700

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARLENE RABINOVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABINOVITCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1982