Rabinovitch, Theodore (CPSO#: 52453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2065 Finch Ave W
Suite 400
Downsview, Ontario M3N2V7
Downsview ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 748-2020
Fax: (416) 748-8582
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theodore Rabinovitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rabinovitch ( CPSO# 52453 )

Business Address:
400 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020


Corporation Name: Rabinovitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rabinovitch ( CPSO# 52453 )

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Suite C2
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
2065 Finch Avenue West
Suite 400
Downsview ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 26 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORE RABINOVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABINOVITCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988