Rabinowitz, Alan Neil (CPSO#: 60235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Paul's Hospital
1081 Burrard Street
Vancouver BC  V6Z 1Y6
Phone: (604) 806-9625
Fax: (604) 806-9629

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ALAN NEIL RABINOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABINOWITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1993