Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rabson, John Lawrence (CPSO#: 58944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
Suite 1217
233 Kennedy Street
Winnipeg MB  R3C 3J5
Phone: (204) 943-4357
Fax: (204) 944-0060

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN LAWRENCE RABSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987