Raby, Bruno (CPSO#: 70918)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 1996 to 10 Jan 1997
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 1997