Raby, Patricia Mary (CPSO#: 51456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
920 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4
Phone: (519) 741-9939
Fax: (519) 741-9388
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia M. Raby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Raby ( CPSO# 51456 )

Business Address:
920 King Street West
Suite 3
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4
Phone Number: (519) 741-9939

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARY RABY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1986