Race, Karen Joy (CPSO#: 67281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Dunstan, Karen Joy (used until: 08 Dec 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite C 4
802 Southdown Road
Mississauga ON  L5J 2Y4
Phone: (289) 628-1930
Fax: (905) 855-3030
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN JOY RACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1993
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Apr 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2012

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 19 Apr 2004
Summary:

 On April 19, 2004, the Fitness to Practice Committee ordered:

1.  The Registrar to remove the 
 suspension imposed by the Executive Committee under s.62 of the Health Professions Procedural 
 Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Profesions Act, 1991; and,

2.This matter be 
 resolved on the basis of the Undertaking dated January 20, 2004, and as amended February 7, 2007,  
 and signed by Dr. Dunstan by which it is agreed that the following is a term, condition and 
 limitation on her certificate of registration:

I may only practise pursuant to the terms of my 
 Contract with the Physician Health Program and my undertaking with the College.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 19 Apr 2004