Rachinsky, Irina Vladimirovna (CPSO#: 83482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Leningradskij Sanitarno Gigieniceskij Me, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room B2-365
Department of Nuclear Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
P O Box 5010
London ON  N6A 4W9
Phone: (519) 667-6570
Fax: (519) 667-6734
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Josheph's Medical Centre
Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 75365
Fax: (519) 663-3876
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

LHSC University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8300
Fax: (519) 663-3876
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2013


Corporation Name: Romsa Warrington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. I. Rachinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rachinsky ( CPSO# 83482 )

Business Address:
LHSC- Victoria Hospital
Department of Nuclear Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6570

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 16 Feb 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2005 to 05 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Irina Vladimirovna Rachinsky may practise medicine independently in nuclear
            medicine.