Rachinsky, Maxim (CPSO#: 83413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:First Leningrad Medical Institute, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 13639
Fax: 5196676734
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2013


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Rachinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rachinsky ( CPSO# 83413 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 May 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Aug 2005 to 10 Jul 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Maxim Rachinsky may practise medicine independently in anaesthesiology.